US SB692 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Water Infrastructure Flexibility Act (Sec. 3) This bill amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to allow municipalities to develop a plan that integrates wastewater and stormwater management. A permit for a municipal discharge under the national pollutant discharge elimination system that incorporates an integrated plan may integrate all requirements under the Act addressed in the plan, including requirements relating to: (1) a combined sewer overflow; (2) a capacity, management, operation, and maintenance program for sanitary sewer collection systems; (3) a municipal stormwater discharge; (4) a municipal wastewater discharge; and (5) a total maximum daily load program. Those permits may include a schedule of compliance that allows actions for meeting water quality-based effluent limitations to be implemented over more than one permit term if the compliance schedules are authorized by state water quality standards. Those actions may include implementing green infrastructure as part of a water quality-based effluent limitation. (Green infrastructure includes measures that mimic natural processes to store, reuse, or reduce stormwater.) The bill establishes an Office of the Municipal Ombudsman in the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to provide: (1) technical assistance to municipalities seeking to comply with the Clean Water Act and the Safe Drinking Water Act, and (2) information to the EPA to ensure that agency policies are implemented by all EPA offices. (Sec. 4) The EPA must ensure that specified EPA offices promote the integration of green infrastructure into permitting programs, planning efforts, research, technical assistance, and funding guidance. (Sec. 5) The bill establishes requirements for revising the EPA's 1997 guidance about combined sewer overflows, including by setting forth criteria for determining the ability of households to pay utility bills. (Combined sewer systems collect rainwater, sewage, and industrial wastewater into one pipe. During storms, the combined wastewater sometimes exceeds the capacity of the treatment plant. When this occurs, combined sewer overflows discharge directly into water bodies.)
Title
Water Infrastructure Flexibility Act
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-10-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6373-6374; text: CR S6373-6374) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | An errata sheet on written report No. 115-87 was printed. (text: 115S.Rept.87 errata) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 109. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-87. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Fisheries, Water, and Wildlife. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-12. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1971 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB2355 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
HB7279 (Related) 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
HB2355 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
HB7279 (Related) 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Licensing and registrations
Public utilities and utility rates
State and local government operations
Water quality
Water use and supply
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Licensing and registrations
Public utilities and utility rates
State and local government operations
Water quality
Water use and supply