US SB712 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Robert Levinson Hostage Recovery and Hostage-Taking Accountability Act This bill establishes various entities and procedures to address the wrongful detainment of U.S. nationals abroad.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Robert Levinson Hostage Recovery and Hostage-Taking Accountability Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-06-18HouseReceived in the House.
2020-06-18SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-06-15SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2977-2979; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2977-2979)
2020-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 462.
2020-06-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
2020-05-21SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-03-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB1611 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback