US SB717 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Became Public Law No: 115-237.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Became Public Law No: 115-237.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
POWER Act Pro bono Work to Empower and Represent Act of 2018 (Sec. 3) This bill requires the chief judge for each judicial district to conduct public events to promote pro bono legal services for survivors of domestic violence, dating violence, sexual assault, and stalking. Additionally, the chief judge for a judicial district that contains an Indian tribe or tribal organization must conduct, at least once during each two-year period, a public event to promote pro bono legal services for Indian or Alaska Native victims of domestic violence, dating violence, sexual assault, and stalking. A chief judge must, in conducting public events, seek to maximize the local impact and the provision of high-quality pro bono legal services to survivors. (Sec. 4) Chief judges must report to the Administrative Office of the U.S. Courts on the public events they conduct. The Administrative Office of the U.S. Courts must compile and summarize the reports and submit them to Congress.
Title
POWER Act Pro bono Work to Empower and Represent Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-04 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-237. |
2018-09-04 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-08-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-08-16 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-08-15 | House | Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5669) |
2018-07-18 | House | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2018-07-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6282-6283) |
2018-07-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 717. |
2018-07-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6282-6285) |
2018-07-17 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-08-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-08-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-08-04 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4694-4695) |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4694-4695) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1762 (Related) 2017-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Domestic violence and child abuse
Lawyers and legal services
Sex offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Domestic violence and child abuse
Lawyers and legal services
Sex offenses