US SB725 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Became Public Law No: 116-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to change the address of the postal facility designated in honor of Captain Humayun Khan. This bill changes the U.S. Postal Service facility designated in Charlottesville, Virginia, in honor of Captain Humayun Khan (from the facility at 180 McCormick Road to the facility at 2150 Wise Street).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to change the address of the postal facility designated in honor of Captain Humayun Khan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-15.
2019-04-16HouseSigned by President.
2019-04-08HousePresented to President.
2019-04-02HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-02HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2971)
2019-04-02HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 725.
2019-04-02HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2971-2972)
2019-04-02HouseMr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-03-26HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-03-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-03-11HouseReceived in the House.
2019-03-11SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1746; text: CR S1746)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback