US SB730 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes trafficking in firearms a stand-alone criminal offense. A person who commits or conspires to commit a gun trafficking offense is subject to criminal penalties—a prison term of up to 20 years (or up to 25 years, if the person also acted as an organizer), a fine, or both.
Title
Hadiya Pendleton and Nyasia Pryear-Yard Gun Trafficking and Crime Prevention Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1670 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3254 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB6318 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3254 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB6318 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Small Business, Oversight and Reform, Agriculture, Rules, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Firearms and explosives
Smuggling and trafficking
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Firearms and explosives
Smuggling and trafficking
U.S. Sentencing Commission
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/730/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s730/BILLS-116s730is.pdf |