US SB731 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the waiver authority of the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) for polygraph examinations of applicants for law enforcement positions in the CBP. Such waiver authority terminates five years after the enactment of this bill. Any individual who receives such waiver and holds a current background investigation may be subject to further background investigation. The CBP may administer a polygraph examination to an applicant for employment or an employee who is eligible for a waiver if information is discovered prior to the completion of a background investigation that makes necessary a final determination regarding suitability for employment or continued employment.
Title
Anti-Border Corruption Improvement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 202. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-99. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1609 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Law enforcement officers
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Law enforcement officers
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation