US SB74 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Members of Congress from being paid during a government shutdown, beginning with the 117th Congress. For the 116th Congress, the bill requires a Member's pay to be deposited in an escrow account during a government shutdown and to be released at the earlier of the end of the shutdown or the end of the Congress.
Title
No Work, No Pay Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB26 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB211 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB236 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB834 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, House Administration, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB845 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB211 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB236 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB834 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, House Administration, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB845 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
Appropriations
Congress
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Members of Congress
Congress
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Members of Congress
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/74/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s74/BILLS-116s74is.pdf |