US SB75 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the Small Business Administration from providing aid, counsel, or assistance to a small business concern that (1) is headquartered in China, or (2) has more than 25% of voting stock owned by citizens of China.
Title
Preventing SBA Assistance from Going to China Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Same As/Similar To
HB595 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB8497 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB8666 (Related) 2020-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB8497 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB8666 (Related) 2020-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Asia
China
Commerce
Corporate finance and management
Foreign and international corporations
Securities
Small business
Small Business Administration
U.S. and foreign investments
Asia
China
Commerce
Corporate finance and management
Foreign and international corporations
Securities
Small business
Small Business Administration
U.S. and foreign investments
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/75/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s75/BILLS-116s75is.pdf |