US SB754 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 440.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 440.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cyber Scholarship Opportunities Act of 2017 This bill requires the National Science Foundation, in coordination with the Office of Personnel Management, to develop and implement a pilot program at community colleges to provide scholarships to students who are pursuing associate degrees or specialized program certifications in cybersecurity and either have bachelor's degrees or are veterans. The bill amends the Cybersecurity Enhancement Act of 2014 to require that the federal cyber scholarship-for-service program: (1) place at least 80% of recipients in an executive agency, and (2) provide awards to improve cybersecurity education at the K-12 levels. The post-award employment obligations of scholarship recipients must include work for an executive agency; Congress; an interstate agency; state, local, or tribal governments; or certain government-affiliated nonprofits. Scholarship eligibility factors are revised to include: (1) an individual's skills and abilities under the National Institute of Standards and Technology's national cybersecurity awareness and education program, and (2) students pursuing a degree on a less than full-time but not less than half-time basis. The bill amends the National Science Foundation Authorization Act of 2002 to include cybersecurity in the definitions of a "mathematics and science teacher" and "science, technology, engineering, or mathematics professional" under the Robert Noyce Teacher Scholarship Program.
Title
Cyber Scholarship Opportunities Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 440. |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-263. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2049) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2184 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Higher education
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Higher education
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula