US SB760 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-134. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-134. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Labor to revise its registered apprenticeship programs to include additional program requirements for increasing the access of veterans and their survivors or dependents to such programs. Labor must acquire written assurance that sponsors of apprenticeship programs (1) are aware of the availability of educational assistance for veterans and eligible individuals for use in such programs, (2) will make a good faith effort to obtain approval for such educational assistance for at least each program location that employs or recruits such recipients, and (3) will not deny a qualified applicant to avoid making a good faith effort to obtain approval for educational assistance. In addition, Labor must (1) require program sponsors to provide standards that contain provisions to grant advanced standing or credit, (2) provide increased wages commensurate to such standing or credit for veterans or individuals eligible for educational assistance, and (3) provide a copy of the approved apprenticeship program's certificate of registration to the state approving agency.
Title
Support for Veterans in Effective Apprenticeships Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 97 (Y: 412 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-134. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 97). (text: 03/10/2020 CR H1574) |
2020-03-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1613-1614) |
2020-03-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-03-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 760. |
2020-03-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1574-1575) |
2020-03-10 | House | Mrs. Lee (NV) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-04 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-12-04 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S6838-6839) |
2019-12-04 | Senate | S.Amdt.1254 Amendment SA 1254 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6838; text: CR S6838) |
2019-12-04 | Senate | S.Amdt.1254 Amendment SA 1254 proposed by Senator Peters. In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6837-6839) |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5314 (Same As) 2019-12-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Labor
Employment and training programs
Labor and employment
Licensing and registrations
State and local government operations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Department of Labor
Employment and training programs
Labor and employment
Licensing and registrations
State and local government operations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation