US SB764 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth procedures for a presidential declaration of a national emergency. The President is authorized to declare a national emergency by proclamation. Such proclamation must be immediately transmitted to Congress and published in the Federal Register. The President must specify the emergency provisions of law being invoked. If Congress does not approve the emergency declaration, the President may not declare an emergency with respect to the same circumstances for the remainder of the term of office. A declaration of emergency shall remain in effect for 30 days from the issuance of the proclamation and shall terminate thereafter unless Congress enacts a joint resolution of approval. If Congress is unable to convene during the 30-day period, such period does not begin until the first day Congress convenes. Unless otherwise terminated by the President or Congress, a declaration of national emergency shall terminate after one year unless it is renewed by the President and approved by a joint resolution of Congress. The bill sets forth procedures for congressional review of declarations of national emergencies and excludes from such procedures certain national emergencies invoking the International Emergency Economic Powers Act (IEEPA). The President shall (1) transmit specified information to Congress with any proclamation declaring or renewing a national emergency, including a description of the circumstances necessitating the declaration or renewal of a national emergency declaration and its estimated duration; and (2) report periodically on the status of the emergency. The bill amends the IEEPA to prohibit the President from using any authorities of such Act to impose duties or tariff-rate quotas.
Title
ARTICLE ONE Act Assuring that Robust, Thorough, and Informed Congressional Leadership is Exercised Over National Emergencies Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] |
Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 307. |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-159. |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1755 (Same As) 2019-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB1809 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1809 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Legislative rules and procedure
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Legislative rules and procedure
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
War and emergency powers