US SB772 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 52.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 52.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the cybersecurity of the Small Business Administration (SBA). Specifically, it requires the SBA to report annually to Congress on (1) an assessment of SBA's information technology (IT) and cybersecurity; (2) a strategy to increase such cybersecurity; (3) a detailed account of SBA's IT component or system manufactured by a company located in the People's Republic of China; and (4) any SBA major incident that occurred during two years before the report, including SBA's actions to respond to or remediate it.
Title
SBA Cyber Awareness Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 52. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Rubio with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2331 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 151.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
Subjects
Asia
China
Commerce
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Small Business Administration
Technology assessment
China
Commerce
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Small Business Administration
Technology assessment