US SB78 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Regulatory Affairs and Federal Management. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Regulatory Affairs and Federal Management. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and the Internal Revenue Service to seek and consider the advice of small entities about a proposed or interim final rule before publishing the rule if the rule will have a significant economic impact on a substantial number of small entities.
Title
Hearing Small Businesses Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Regulatory Affairs and Federal Management. Hearings held. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4601 (Same As) 2019-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB4603 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4603 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of the Interior
Department of the Treasury
Economic performance and conditions
Government operations and politics
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Small business
Department of the Interior
Department of the Treasury
Economic performance and conditions
Government operations and politics
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/78/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s78/BILLS-116s78is.pdf |