US SB788 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination based on sex, sexual orientation, and gender identity in areas including public accommodations and facilities, education, federal funding, employment, housing, credit, and the jury system. Specifically, the bill defines and includes sex, sexual orientation, and gender identity among the prohibited categories of discrimination or segregation. The bill expands the definition of public accommodations to include places or establishments that provide (1) exhibitions, recreation, exercise, amusement, gatherings, or displays; (2) goods, services, or programs; and (3) transportation services. The bill allows the Department of Justice to intervene in equal protection actions in federal court on account of sexual orientation or gender identity. The bill prohibits an individual from being denied access to a shared facility, including a restroom, a locker room, and a dressing room, that is in accordance with the individual's gender identity.
Title
Equality Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR377 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2402 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2687 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HR377 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2402 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2687 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Consumer credit
Due process and equal protection
Elementary and secondary education
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Higher education
Housing discrimination
Judicial procedure and administration
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Religion
Retail and wholesale trades
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Sports and recreation facilities
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Consumer credit
Due process and equal protection
Elementary and secondary education
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Higher education
Housing discrimination
Judicial procedure and administration
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Religion
Retail and wholesale trades
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Sports and recreation facilities
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/788/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s788/BILLS-116s788is.pdf |