US SB846 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-15-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transit Infrastructure Vehicle Security Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transit Infrastructure Vehicle Security Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2019-03-14SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB2739 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB1663 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-07-02 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback