US SB849 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Defense to authorize inclusion on the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Wall in the District of Columbia of the names of the 74 crew members of the USS Frank E. Evans killed on June 3, 1969.
Title
U.S.S. Frank E. Evans Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Monuments and memorials
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam
Asia
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Monuments and memorials
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/849/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s849/BILLS-116s849is.pdf |