US SB850 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2021 a grant program to provide innovative transportation options to veterans in highly rural areas.
Title
Highly Rural Veteran Transportation Program Extension Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-08-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4648) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | The committee amendment as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4647) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.2502 Amendment SA 2502 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.2502 Amendment SA 2502 proposed by Senator Sullivan. (consideration: CR S4647-4648; text: CR S4647-4648) To require a report by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs on the transportation of individuals to and from facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4647-4648) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment. Without written report. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1807 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4524 (Related) 2019-10-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2966 (Related) 2019-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
HB4524 (Related) 2019-10-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2966 (Related) 2019-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Health care coverage and access
Rural conditions and development
Transportation costs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Health care coverage and access
Rural conditions and development
Transportation costs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition