US SB874 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to cancel removal and grant lawful permanent resident status on a conditional basis to an alien who is inadmissible or deportable or is in temporary protected status who (1) has been continuously physically present in the United States for four years preceding this bill's enactment; (2) was younger than 18 years of age on the initial date of U.S. entry; (3) is not inadmissible on various grounds such as those related to crime or security; and (4) has fulfilled specified educational requirements. DHS shall cancel the removal of, and adjust to the status of an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence on a conditional basis, an alien who was granted Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) status unless the alien has engaged in conduct that would make the alien ineligible for DACA. DHS shall remove the conditional basis of the permanent resident status granted under this bill if the alien meets various requirements, such as (1) maintaining residence in the United States, and (2) acquiring a degree from an institution of higher education or serving in the Uniformed Services. DHS may not disclose or use information provided in applications filed under this bill or in DACA requests for immigration enforcement purposes. The bill repeals a restriction barring states from providing higher education benefits to undocumented aliens unless those benefits are available to all U.S. citizens.
Title
Dream Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
HB2820 (Related) 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
HR415 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2820 (Related) 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
HR415 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Citizenship and naturalization
Department of Homeland Security
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Higher education
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
Preschool education
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Administrative remedies
Citizenship and naturalization
Department of Homeland Security
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Higher education
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
Preschool education
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/874/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s874/BILLS-116s874is.pdf |