US SB88 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates the Ocmulgee National Monument in Georgia as the Ocmulgee Mounds National Historical Park. The boundary of the park is adjusted to include 2,100 acres of land. The Department of the Interior may acquire lands and interests within the boundaries of the park by donation, purchase, or exchange, but not by condemnation. Interior shall conduct a special resource study of the Ocmulgee River corridor between the cities of Macon, Georgia, and Hawkinsville, Georgia, to evaluate the national significance of the study area, and determine the suitability and feasibility of designating the study area as a unit of the National Park System.
Title
Ocmulgee Mounds National Historical Park Boundary Revision Act
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB283 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB283 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Georgia
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Georgia
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/88/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s88/BILLS-116s88is.pdf |