US SB886 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes the Reclamation Water Settlements Fund permanent. Currently, it terminates at the end of FY2034.
Title
Indian Water Rights Settlement Extension Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-06-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | S.Amdt.1592 Amendment SA 1592 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | S.Amdt.1592 Amendment SA 1592 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Udall. (consideration: CR S2745; text: CR S2738-2742) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S2745) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2743-2745) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 397. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-189. |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1904 (Same As) 2020-07-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 352.
HB3292 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB895 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate.
HB644 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 557.
HB3292 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB895 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate.
HB644 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 557.
Subjects
Department of the Treasury
Executive agency funding and structure
Indian lands and resources rights
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Indian lands and resources rights
Water resources development
Water resources funding