US SB893 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-129. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-129. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the President, in consultation with relevant federal agencies, to develop a strategy to secure and protect U.S. fifth and future generations (5G) systems and infrastructure. Such strategy, to be known as the National Strategy to Secure 5G and Next Generation Wireless Communications, shall (1) ensure the security of 5G wireless communications systems and infrastructure within the United States; (2) assist mutual defense treaty allies, strategic partners, and other countries in maximizing the security of 5G systems and infrastructure; and (3) protect the competitiveness of U.S. companies, privacy of U.S. consumers, and integrity of standards-setting bodies.
Title
Secure 5G and Beyond Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-129. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-11 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1614-1615) |
2020-03-11 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1614-1615) |
2020-03-11 | House | Mr. Pallone asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2020-03-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-03-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1501-1502) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | S.Amdt.1510 Amendment SA 1510 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | S.Amdt.1510 Amendment SA 1510 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S1507; text: CR S1501-1502) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1506-1507) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 395. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-184. |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2881 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 403.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alliances
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Research and development
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment
Telephone and wireless communication
Alliances
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Research and development
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment
Telephone and wireless communication