US SB900 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-262.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-262.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Bozeman, Montana, as the Travis W. Atkins Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic or the Travis W. Atkins VA Clinic.
Title
A bill to designate the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Bozeman, Montana, as the "Travis W. Atkins Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic".
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-262. |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 900 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7431) |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2020-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5745) |
2020-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 900. |
2020-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5745-5746) |
2020-11-16 | House | Mrs. Luria moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-11-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6767) |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6766-6767) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text: CR S2048-2049) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1918 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Montana
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Montana
Veterans' medical care