US SB906 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on January 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Vetoed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Vetoed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses certain driftnet fishing. (Driftnet fishing is a method of fishing in which a gillnet composed of a panel or panels of webbing, or a series of such gillnets, is placed in the water and allowed to drift with the currents and winds for the purpose of entangling fish in the webbing.) Currently, the use of large-scale drift gillnets with a total length of 2.5 kilometers or more is prohibited in the United States. The bill expands the definition of large-scale driftnet fishing to prohibit the use of gillnets with a mesh size of 14 inches or greater. This expanded prohibition does not apply within the U.S. exclusive economic zone for five years. The Department of Commerce must conduct a transition program to facilitate the phase out of large-scale driftnet fishing and to promote the adoption of alternative fishing practices that minimize the incidental catch of living marine resources. Commerce must award grants to program participants. The North Pacific Fishery Management Council may recommend and Commerce may approve regulations that require charter operators to pay fees on vessels that harvest Pacific halibut in specific International Pacific Halibut Commission regulatory areas.
Title
Driftnet Modernization and Bycatch Reduction Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 283 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Senate | Vetoed by President. |
2021-01-01 | Senate | Veto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk. (consideration: CR S8001-8002; text: CR S8002) |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 283 - 105 (Roll no. 242). (text: CR H7115) |
2020-12-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7126-7127) |
2020-12-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 906. |
2020-12-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7115-7118) |
2020-12-10 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-07-23 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-07-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4398-4399; text: CR S4398-4399) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 316. |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment. With written report No. 116-166. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1979 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Pacific Ocean
Public lands and natural resources
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Pacific Ocean
Public lands and natural resources