US SB918 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 164.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 164.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constrains the President and executive agencies from constructing, operating, or offering wholesale or retail service on a broadband network unless given authority to do so by Congress. The Government Accountability Office must study and report on potential threats facing U.S. broadband networks from China, Iran, Russia, and other foreign adversaries and the risks of using foreign equipment and services in U.S. broadband networks.
Title
E-FRONTIER Act Eliminate From Regulators Opportunities to Nationalize The Internet in Every Respect Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 164. |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with amendments. With written report No. 116-66. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2063 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Asia
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Iran
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Science, technology, communications
Subversive activities
Telephone and wireless communication
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Iran
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Science, technology, communications
Subversive activities
Telephone and wireless communication