US SB924 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Department of Health and Human Services to provide grants for evidence-informed child sexual abuse awareness and prevention programs. The grants may be awarded for a period of up to five years.
Title
Jenna Quinn Law
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-09-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2658 Amendment SA 2658 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2658 Amendment SA 2658 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S5716; text: CR S5716) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5716) |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8396 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Elementary and secondary education
Families
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement administration and funding
School administration
Sex offenses
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Child safety and welfare
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Elementary and secondary education
Families
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement administration and funding
School administration
Sex offenses
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Teaching, teachers, curricula