US SB94 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a state to use federal funds to cover a higher percentage of the costs for the construction and expansion of public target ranges. Specifically, a state may use specified federal grant funds to pay up to 90% of such costs (rather than 75%, as under current law). Additionally, amounts provided for these purposes shall remain available for five fiscal years (rather than two, as under current law).
Title
Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate vitiated previous passage. (CR S2502) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2393; text: CR S2393) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-8. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 18. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB1222 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Became Public Law No: 116-17. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB1222 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Became Public Law No: 116-17. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Firearms and explosives
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Solid waste and recycling
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Solid waste and recycling
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection