US SB964 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands eligibility for additional cost-sharing reductions that apply to certain enrollees of qualified health plans. Specifically, it increases the income thresholds under which plan holders receive such cost-sharing reductions and increases the percentage of the shared costs paid by the plan at each income threshold.
Title
Marketplace Certainty Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1346 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB1213 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2452 (Related) 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB2463 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB1261 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1213 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2452 (Related) 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB2463 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB1261 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/964/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s964/BILLS-116s964is.pdf |