US SB965 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes each military department to carry out a program to award scholarships to Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps members to assist them in obtaining private pilot's licenses through approved institutions of higher education. The bill also requires a report on the results of an assessment of the Air Force aviation training program known as the "JROTC Flight Academy, Chief of Staff Private Pilot Scholarship Program," conducted in 2018 and 2019.
Title
Ceiling and Visibility Unlimited Act
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2892 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2892 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Elementary and secondary education
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Licensing and registrations
Military education and training
Student aid and college costs
Transportation employees
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Elementary and secondary education
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Licensing and registrations
Military education and training
Student aid and college costs
Transportation employees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/965/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s965/BILLS-116s965is.pdf |