US SB982 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 116-166. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 116-166. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the coordination of efforts to reduce violent crime within Indian lands and against Indians. Specifically, the Department of the Interior must designate an official within the Bureau of Indian Affairs to coordinate prevention efforts, grants, and programs related to missing Indians and the murder and human trafficking of Indians. In addition, Interior and the Department of Justice (DOJ) must (1) establish a joint commission on violent crime within Indian lands and against Indians, and (2) submit a written response to the recommendations developed by the joint commission. The joint commission must develop and make publicly available recommendations to Interior and DOJ on actions to combat violent crime against Indians and within Indian lands, including recommendations for identifying, reporting, and responding to instances of missing persons, murder, and human trafficking.
Title
Not Invisible Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-10 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-166. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-10 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4579-4580) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 982. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4579-4581) |
2020-09-21 | House | Ms. Scanlon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-03-12 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-03-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1709-1710; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1709-1710) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 417. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-214. |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2438 (Same As) 2020-09-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 409.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Department of the Interior
Employee hiring
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Human trafficking
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Missing persons
Native Americans
State and local government operations
Violent crime
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Department of the Interior
Employee hiring
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Human trafficking
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Missing persons
Native Americans
State and local government operations
Violent crime