US SB995 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 and revises the Lifespan Respite Care Program, which supports state lifespan respite care services (i.e., services for family caregivers of children and adults with special needs). The bill requires each state agency that is awarded a grant under the program to report any data required by the Department of Health and Human Services for program monitoring and evaluation.
Title
Lifespan Respite Care Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-02-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1105; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1105) |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 283. |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2191-2192) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2035 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
HB8906 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-324.
HB8906 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-324.
Subjects
Child health
Disability assistance
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Performance measurement
Disability assistance
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Performance measurement