US SB998 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-32. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-32. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes for FY2020-FY2024 and revises Department of Justice grants to provide family support services to law enforcement personnel. Among other changes, the bill allows grants to support additional services such as suicide prevention and mental health programs.
Title
Supporting and Treating Officers In Crisis Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-32. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2019-07-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5329) |
2019-07-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 998. |
2019-07-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5329-5331) |
2019-07-10 | House | Ms. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2948; text: CR S2948) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 81. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with an amendment. Without written report. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2368 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 103.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Disability and paralysis
Family services
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical research
Mental health
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Worker safety and health
Disability and paralysis
Family services
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical research
Mental health
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Worker safety and health