US SCR1 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution expresses support for peace and democracy in Nigeria and calls on Nigeria's government and political parties to take all actions to ensure that elections are credible, transparent, and peaceful in order to support the will of the people. It also calls on the government to respect the impartiality of the Independent National Electoral Commission and take measures to combat vote buying.
Title
A concurrent resolution calling for credible, transparent, and safe elections in Nigeria, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-02-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1393-1394) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.191 Amendment SA 191 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.191 Amendment SA 191 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S1393; text: CR S1393) To amend the preamble. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.190 Amendment SA 190 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.190 Amendment SA 190 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S1393; text: CR S1393) To provide a complete substitute. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1393-1394) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR4 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations.
Subjects
Africa
Conflicts and wars
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Nigeria
Political parties and affiliation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Conflicts and wars
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Nigeria
Political parties and affiliation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status