US SCR13 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution affirms that the Taiwan Relations Act and the Six Assurances will remain cornerstones of the U.S.-Taiwan relationship. It encourages increasing engagement between the United States and Taiwan and states that the President should conduct regular transfers of defense articles to Taiwan. (The United States made the Six Assurances to Taiwan in 1982, stating that it will not pressure Taiwan to negotiate with China and that it has not agreed to consult with China prior to any arms sales to Taiwan.)
Title
A concurrent resolution reaffirming the United States commitment to Taiwan and to the implementation of the Taiwan Relations Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Homeland Security, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Homeland Security, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Homeland Security, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Homeland Security, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-05-02 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 4/4/2019 S2280-2281) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2525) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HR273 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Asia
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Taiwan
Terrorism
Trade agreements and negotiations
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Taiwan
Terrorism
Trade agreements and negotiations
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports