US SCR15 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of October 28, 2019, as Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day.
Title
A concurrent resolution expressing support for the designation of October 28, 2019, as "Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-06-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3266-3267; text: CR 05/01/2019 S2576) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 108. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment and with a preamble. With written report No. 116-43. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR37 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 92.
HCR99 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
SCR48 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S5987)
HCR99 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
SCR48 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S5987)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel
Congressional tributes
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel