US SCR19 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Pending: House Science, Space, And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Pending: House Science, Space, And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution celebrates the 50th anniversary of the Apollo 11 Moon landing. The resolution also honors the bravery and skill of the crew of Apollo 11, Neil Armstrong, Edwin E. "Buzz" Aldrin, and Michael Collins; and commends the efforts of all individuals of the United States who contributed to the achievement of the Apollo 11 Moon landing.
Title
A concurrent resolution celebrating the 50th anniversary of the Apollo 11 Moon landing.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Richard Shelby [R-AL] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2019-07-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 6/5/2019 S3265-3266) |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4955) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR47 (Same As) 2019-06-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Science, technology, communications
Space flight and exploration
U.S. history
Congressional tributes
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Science, technology, communications
Space flight and exploration
U.S. history