US SCR24 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution recognizes the valuable historic and continued contributions of the Food and Nutrition Service and its employees to the nutrition, health, and well-being of the people of the United States.
Title
A concurrent resolution recognizing the 50th anniversary of the Food and Nutrition Service of the Department of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations. |
2019-08-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2019-08-02 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5275; text: CR S5260) |
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Congressional tributes
Department of Agriculture
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Nutrition and diet
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
U.S. history
Congressional tributes
Department of Agriculture
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Nutrition and diet
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
U.S. history