US SCR25 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution recognizing September 11, 2019, as a "National Day of Service and Remembrance".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution recognizing September 11, 2019, as a "National Day of Service and Remembrance".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-17HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-09-17HouseReceived in the House.
2019-09-17SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-09-16SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5495; text: CR S5495)

Same As/Similar To

HCR60 (Same As) 2019-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback