US SCR38 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution establishes a Joint Congressional Committee on Inaugural Ceremonies to make the necessary arrangements for the inauguration of the President-elect and Vice President-elect of the United States on January 20, 2021.
Title
A concurrent resolution to establish the Joint Congressional Committee on Inaugural Ceremonies for the inauguration of the President-elect and Vice President-elect of the United States on January 20, 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-06-26 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H2557) |
2020-06-26 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2557) |
2020-06-26 | House | Mrs. Davis (CA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2020-05-08 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-05-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2296; text: CR S2295) |
Subjects
Congress
Congressional committees
Congressional operations and organization
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Congressional committees
Congressional operations and organization
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents