US SCR44 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-10-2)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5615-5616)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5615-5616)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution (1) calls on the Members of Congress and all people of the United States to observe September 11, 2020, as a National Day of Service and Remembrance in honor of those who lost their lives or were injured in the September 11, 2001, attacks and in tribute to those who came to the aid of those in need and to the defense of the United States; and (2) recognizes the heroic actions of first responders and other citizens in New York, New York, the District of Columbia, and Shanksville, Pennsylvania.
Title
A concurrent resolution recognizing September 11, 2020, as "National Day of Service and Remembrance".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5615-5616) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR115 (Same As) 2020-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HCR60 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SCR25 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HCR60 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SCR25 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime victims
District of Columbia
First responders and emergency personnel
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Military personnel and dependents
National and community service
National symbols
New York City
Pennsylvania
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Terrorism
Virginia
Crime victims
District of Columbia
First responders and emergency personnel
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Military personnel and dependents
National and community service
National symbols
New York City
Pennsylvania
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Terrorism
Virginia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-concurrent-resolution/44/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sconres44/BILLS-116sconres44is.pdf |