US SCR48 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S5987)
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S5987)
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution supports the designation of October 28, 2020, as Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day.
Title
A concurrent resolution expressing support for the designation of October 28, 2020, as "Honoring the Nation's First Responders Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S5987) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR37 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 92.
HCR99 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
SCR15 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Held at the desk.
HCR99 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
SCR15 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel
Congressional tributes
Emergency management
First responders and emergency personnel
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-concurrent-resolution/48/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sconres48/BILLS-116sconres48is.pdf |