US SJR10 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1600-1601)
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1600-1601)
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution terminates the national emergency related to the U.S.-Mexico border, declared by the President on February 15, 2019.
Title
A joint resolution relating to a national emergency declared by the President on February 15, 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1600-1601) |
Same As/Similar To
HJR46 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - The Chair announced that the bill and accompanying veto message were referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. The Chair directed the Clerk to notify the Senate of the action of the House.
SJR54 (Same As) 2019-10-17 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 36. Record Vote Number: 325.
HJR75 (Same As) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HR591 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR85 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
SJR54 (Same As) 2019-10-17 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 36. Record Vote Number: 325.
HJR75 (Same As) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HR591 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR85 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Immigration
Latin America
Mexico
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
Immigration
Latin America
Mexico
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/10/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sjres10/BILLS-116sjres10is.pdf |