US SJR30 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval of the proposed foreign military sale to the United Arab Emirates of certain defense articles and services. This joint resolution prohibits the proposed sale of various defense articles and related support services to the United Arab Emirates, as described in Transmittal No. 19-18 and published in the Congressional Record on June 4, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval of the proposed foreign military sale to the United Arab Emirates of certain defense articles and services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 179 (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-06-20HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-06-20HouseReceived in the House.
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 45. Record Vote Number: 179. (text: CR S4143)
2019-06-20SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S4142-4143)
2019-06-19SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3831-3834)
2019-06-19SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2019-06-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback