US SJR40 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution prohibits the proposed export of various defense articles and related support services to India, Israel, South Korea, and Saudi Arabia, as described in Executive Communication 1417 and published in the Congressional Record on June 3, 2019.
Title
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval of the proposed export to India, Israel, Republic of Korea, and Kingdom of Saudi Arabia of certain defense articles, including technical data and defense services.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 179 (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-06-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 45. Record Vote Number: 179. (text: CR S4144) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S4142-4143) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3831-3834) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Subjects
Asia
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
India
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Saudi Arabia
South Korea
Trade restrictions
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
India
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Saudi Arabia
South Korea
Trade restrictions