US SJR56 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution nullifies a rule issued by the Department of Education (ED) on September 23, 2019. The rule revised the process for a student loan borrower to obtain a discharge from a student loan if an institution of higher education misrepresented a material fact. Among other requirements, the 2019 rule requires each borrower to apply to ED for a defense to repayment. However, under the previous 2016 rule, an application could be submitted on behalf of an entire group (e.g., veterans).
Title
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Education relating to "Borrower Defense Institutional Accountability".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure RC# 69 (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1678) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S1660-1661) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 41. Record Vote Number: 69. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5752) |
Same As/Similar To
HJR76 (Same As) 2020-06-26 - The Chair announced that the bill and accompanying veto message were referred to the Committee on Education and Labor. The Chair directed the Clerk to notify the Senate of the action of the House.
HR790 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR981 (Similar To) 2020-05-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR790 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR981 (Similar To) 2020-05-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Congressional oversight
Department of Education
Education
Educational facilities and institutions
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Congressional oversight
Department of Education
Education
Educational facilities and institutions
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Student aid and college costs