US SJR69 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution directs the President to remove U.S. Armed Forces engaged in hostilities against Iran unless explicitly authorized by a congressional declaration of war or a specific authorization for use of military force.
Title
A joint resolution to direct the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities against the Islamic Republic of Iran that have not been authorized by Congress.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR68 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 44. Record Vote Number: 84.
HJR82 (Related) 2020-01-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SJR63 (Related) 2020-01-14 - S.Amdt.1281 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR82 (Related) 2020-01-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SJR63 (Related) 2020-01-14 - S.Amdt.1281 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/69/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sjres69/BILLS-116sjres69is.pdf |