US SJR7 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 94.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A joint resolution to direct the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities in the Republic of Yemen that have not been authorized by Congress. This joint resolution directs the President to remove U.S. Armed Forces from hostilities in or affecting Yemen within 30 days unless Congress authorizes a later withdrawal date, issues a declaration of war, or specifically authorizes the use of the Armed Forces. Prohibited activities include providing in-flight fueling for non-U.S. aircraft conducting missions as part of the conflict in Yemen. This joint resolution shall not affect any military operations directed at Al Qaeda. The President must submit to Congress, within 90 days, reports assessing the risks that would be posed (1) if the United States were to cease supporting operations with respect to the conflict in Yemen, and (2) if Saudi Arabia were to cease sharing Yemen-related intelligence with the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution to direct the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities in the Republic of Yemen that have not been authorized by Congress.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Failed of passage in Senate over veto RC# 94 (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - On passage RC# 153 (Y: 247 N: 175 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - On motion to commit with instructions RC# 152 (Y: 194 N: 228 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amendments RC# 48 (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Motion to table amendment SA 194 S.Amdt.194 RC# 47 (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseFailed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 94.
2019-05-02HouseVeto Message considered in Senate.
2019-04-29HouseVeto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk.
2019-04-16HouseVetoed by President.
2019-04-16HousePresented to President.
2019-04-04HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-04HouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 247 - 175, 1 Present (Roll no. 153). (text: CR H3075-3076)
2019-04-04HouseOn motion to commit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 194 - 228, 1 Present (Roll no. 152).
2019-04-04HouseThe previous question on the motion to commit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2019-04-04HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the McCaul motion to commit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report to the House an amendment adding a new paragraph after section 1 pertaining to the national security interest of the United States to condemn and oppose the Global Boycott, Divestment, and Sanctions Movement targeting Israel, including efforts to target United States companies that are engaged in commercial activities that are legal under United States law.
2019-04-04HouseMr. McCaul moved to commit with instructions to the Committee on Foreign Affairs. (text: CR H3081)
2019-04-04HousePursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, the House resumed consideration of S.J.Res. 7. (consideration: CR H3081-3083)
2019-04-04HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on S.J. Res 7, the Chair postponed proceedings pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19.
2019-04-04HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-04-04HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 7.
2019-04-04HouseRule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 7 and H. Res. 271. Rule provides for the previous question to be considered as ordered without intervening motions for both measures except for one hour of debate; one motion to recommit S.J. Res. 7 is allowed. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of April 4, 2019 for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
2019-04-04HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 274. (consideration: CR H3075-3080)
2019-04-01HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 274 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 7 and H. Res. 271. Rule provides for the previous question to be considered as ordered without intervening motions for both measures except for one hour of debate; one motion to recommit S.J. Res. 7 is allowed. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of April 4, 2019 for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
2019-03-18HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-03-18HouseReceived in the House.
2019-03-14SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-03-13SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 46. Record Vote Number: 48. (text: CR S1835-1836)
2019-03-13SenateS.Amdt.195 Amendment SA 195 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
2019-03-13SenateS.Amdt.194 Motion to table amendment SA 194 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 48. Record Vote Number: 47.
2019-03-13SenateS.Amdt.193 Amendment SA 193 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
2019-03-13SenateS.Amdt.195 Amendment SA 195 proposed by Senator Lee for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S1829-1835; text: CR S1829) To provide a rule of construction regarding intelligence sharing.
2019-03-13SenateS.Amdt.194 Amendment SA 194 proposed by Senator Lee for Senator Inhofe. (consideration: CR S1829-1835; text: CR S1829) To provide an exception for supporting efforts to defend against ballistic missile, cruise missile, and unmanned aerial vehicle threats to civilian population centers in coalition countries, including locations where citizens and nationals of the United States reside.
2019-03-13SenateS.Amdt.193 Amendment SA 193 proposed by Senator Lee for Senator Paul. (consideration: CR S1829-1835; text: CR S1829) To provide that nothing in the joint resolution may be construed as authorizing the use of military force.
2019-03-13SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1829-1836)
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2019-01-30SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HJR37 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR122 (Similar To) 2019-02-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR274 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback