US SJR8 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 0 - 57. Record Vote Number: 52. (CR S1971)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 0 - 57. Record Vote Number: 52. (CR S1971)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution declares that the government has a duty to create a Green New Deal with the goals of achieving net-zero greenhouse gas emissions; establishing millions of high-wage jobs and ensuring economic security for all; investing in infrastructure and industry; securing clean air and water, climate and community resiliency, healthy food, access to nature, and a sustainable environment for all; and promoting justice and equality. The joint resolution calls for accomplishment of these goals through a 10-year national mobilization effort. The resolution also enumerates the goals and projects of the mobilization effort, including building smart power grids (i.e., power grids that enable customers to reduce their power use during peak demand periods); upgrading all existing buildings and constructing new buildings to achieve maximum energy and water efficiency; removing pollution and greenhouse gas emissions from the transportation and agricultural sectors; cleaning up existing hazardous waste and abandoned sites; ensuring businesspersons are free from unfair competition; and providing higher education, high-quality health care, and affordable, safe, and adequate housing to all.
Title
A joint resolution recognizing the duty of the Federal Government to create a Green New Deal.
Sponsors
Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure RC# 52 (Y: 0 N: 57 NV: 43 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 0 - 57. Record Vote Number: 52. (CR S1971) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S1964) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S1882) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1882) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 27. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text: CR S1327-1328) |
Same As/Similar To
HR109 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SR59 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text: CR S1140-1142)
SR59 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text: CR S1140-1142)
Subjects
Aging
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Competition and antitrust
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Disability and paralysis
Disaster relief and insurance
Ecology
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Environmental protection
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Federal-Indian relations
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Forests, forestry, trees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing supply and affordability
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Industrial facilities
Infrastructure development
International organizations and cooperation
Labor-management relations
Land use and conservation
Manufacturing
Natural disasters
Outdoor recreation
Property rights
Public contracts and procurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Rural conditions and development
Scientific communication
Technology transfer and commercialization
Transportation programs funding
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Women's rights
Worker safety and health
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Competition and antitrust
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Disability and paralysis
Disaster relief and insurance
Ecology
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Environmental protection
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Federal-Indian relations
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Forests, forestry, trees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing supply and affordability
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Industrial facilities
Infrastructure development
International organizations and cooperation
Labor-management relations
Land use and conservation
Manufacturing
Natural disasters
Outdoor recreation
Property rights
Public contracts and procurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Rural conditions and development
Scientific communication
Technology transfer and commercialization
Transportation programs funding
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Women's rights
Worker safety and health