US SR100 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 3/7/2019 S1743-1744)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 3/7/2019 S1743-1744)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution celebrates the successes of American Indian, Alaska Native, and Native Hawaiian women and the contributions they have made in the United States. The resolution also recognizes the importance of supporting equity, providing safety, and upholding the interests of these women.
Title
A resolution recognizing the heritage, culture, and contributions of American Indian, Alaska Native, and Native Hawaiian women in the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 3/7/2019 S1743-1744) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2099-2100) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SR565 (Same As) 2020-05-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2329; text: CR S2327)
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Congressional tributes
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Racial and ethnic relations
Women's employment
Women's rights
Congressional tributes
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Racial and ethnic relations
Women's employment
Women's rights