US SR117 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 3/14/2019 S1908-1909)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 3/14/2019 S1908-1909)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates March 22, 2019, as National Rehabilitation Counselors Appreciation Day. Additionally, the resolution commends rehabilitation counselors and professional organizations assisting individuals who require rehabilitation.
Title
A resolution designating March 22, 2019, as "National Rehabilitation Counselors Appreciation Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 3/14/2019 S1908-1909) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2000) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Health
Health personnel
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Health
Health personnel
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations