US SR126 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3-2)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of the week of March 25-March 29, 2019, as Public Schools Week.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week of March 25 through March 29, 2019, as "Public Schools Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057) |
Same As/Similar To
HR254 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR862 (Related) 2020-02-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR521 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1233-1234)
HR862 (Related) 2020-02-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR521 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1233-1234)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/126/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres126/BILLS-116sres126ats.pdf |